MN SF383 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus human services reform budget bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus human services reform budget bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateLaid on table
2021-04-29SenateThird reading Passed
2021-04-29SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2021-04-26SenateSecond reading
2021-04-26SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2021-04-13SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy
2021-01-28SenateIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback