MN SF3808 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Miscellaneous retirement provisions modifications

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miscellaneous retirement provisions modifications

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-05-27 Governor approval
2020-05-27 Secretary of State Chapter 108
2020-05-27 Governor's action Approval
2020-05-18 Presented to Governor
2020-05-17SenateReturned from House
2020-05-17HouseBill was passed
2020-05-17HouseThird reading
2020-05-15HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 17, 2020
2020-05-15HouseSecond reading
2020-05-15HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2020-05-14HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3903
2020-05-14HouseReceived from Senate
2020-05-14SenateThird reading Passed
2020-05-14SenateSpecial Order
2020-05-13SenateSecond reading
2020-05-13SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report Jt. rule 2.03 suspended
2020-05-13SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2020-05-13SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2020-03-04SenateAuthor added Simonson
2020-03-02SenateReferred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections
2020-03-02SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3903 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback