MN SF3800 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Money transmission provisions regulation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Money transmission provisions regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-05-27 Governor approval
2020-05-27 Secretary of State Chapter 107
2020-05-27 Governor's action Approval
2020-05-18 Presented to Governor
2020-05-17SenateReturned from House
2020-05-17HouseBill was passed
2020-05-17HouseThird reading
2020-05-15HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 17, 2020
2020-05-14HouseSecond reading
2020-05-14HouseBills identical, SF substituted on General Register
2020-05-13HouseReferred to Chief Clerk for comparison with HF3904
2020-05-13HouseMotion prevailed
2020-05-13HouseMotion to recall
2020-05-07HouseSenate file first reading, referred to Commerce
2020-05-07HouseReceived from Senate
2020-05-06SenateThird reading Passed
2020-05-06SenateSpecial Order
2020-03-12SenateSecond reading
2020-03-12SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy
2020-02-27SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3904 (Similar To) 2020-05-14 - HF indefinitely postponed

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback