MN SF3766 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-12 - Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Universal, voluntary home visiting program for families with infants establishment and appropriation
Title
Universal, voluntary home visiting program for families with infants establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] | Sen. Charles Wiger [D] | Sen. Sandra Pappas [D] |
Sen. Mary Kunesh-Podein [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders (Y: 31 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Motion did not prevail to withdraw and be placed on General Orders |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Authors added Pappas; Kunesh |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3886 (Similar To) 2022-04-21 - Author added Moran