MN SF3755 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Chief author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Chief author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nursing facility moratorium exception funding authorization
Title
Nursing facility moratorium exception funding authorization
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Chief author added Abeler |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Chief author stricken Simonson |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3865 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Long-Term Care Division