MN SF374 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Lang
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-21 - Author added Lang
Pending: Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hmong Veterans Day state holiday establishment
Title
Hmong Veterans Day state holiday establishment
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Foung Hawj [D] | Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] |
Sen. Andrew Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Author added Lang |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF919 (Similar To) 2019-03-14 - Second reading