MN SF3705 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Westrom
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Red River basin commission recognition, membership, duties, and appropriation
Title
Red River basin commission recognition, membership, duties, and appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4078 (Similar To) 2018-03-28 - Author added Lien.