MN SF3697 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Lopez Franzen
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Author added Lopez Franzen
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety aid for local governments and Tribal governments establishment and appropriation
Title
Public safety aid for local governments and Tribal governments establishment and appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Rest [D] | Sen. Kari Dziedzic [D] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] | Sen. Aric Putnam [D] |
Sen. Melisa Franzen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Author added Lopez Franzen |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Author stricken Klein |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Authors added Bigham; Putnam |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4027 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes