MN SF3692 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus tax bill
Title
Omnibus tax bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Laid on table |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3669 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Senate conferees Nelson; Weber; Bakk; Gazelka; Rest