MN SF3667 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Request for proposals to replace Department of Natural Resources registration system to the driver and vehicle registration system requirement
Title
Request for proposals to replace Department of Natural Resources registration system to the driver and vehicle registration system requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4559 (Similar To) 2022-03-23 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy