MN SF3658 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal notes effective dates and legislative budget office provisions modifications
Title
Fiscal notes effective dates and legislative budget office provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3771 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance