MN SF3630 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Collaborative Urban and Greater Minnesota Educators of Color Grant Program provisions modifications
Title
Collaborative Urban and Greater Minnesota Educators of Color Grant Program provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Author stricken Torres Ray |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Author stricken Wiger |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |