MN SF3596 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 133 05/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Secretary of State Chapter 133 05/14/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minimum biodiesel content level for diesel fuel modification at certain times; number 1 diesel exemption extension
Title
Minimum biodiesel content level for diesel fuel modification at certain times; number 1 diesel exemption extension
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Weber [R] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House: Passage (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Secretary of State Chapter 133 05/14/18 | |
2018-05-15 | Governor's action Approval 05/14/18 | |
2018-05-14 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-14 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-10 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Returned from House |
2018-05-08 | House | Bill was passed vote: 121-0 |
2018-05-08 | House | Third reading |
2018-05-03 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 08, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Second reading |
2018-04-23 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2018-04-19 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3523 |
2018-04-19 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 67-0 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Author added Rosen |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3523 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - HF indefinitely postponed