MN SF3589 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-18 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Banks and trust companies authorized investment modification
Title
Banks and trust companies authorized investment modification
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] |
Sen. Melissa Wiklund [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-05-18 | Governor approval | |
2020-05-18 | Secretary of State Chapter 95 | |
2020-05-18 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-05-16 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Returned from House |
2020-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 15, 2020 |
2020-05-12 | House | Second reading |
2020-05-12 | House | Bills identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-11 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF4067 |
2020-05-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Author added Wiklund |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4067 (Similar To) 2020-05-12 - HF indefinitely postponed