MN SF3580 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Independent 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Taconite economic development fund use clarification and 2018 distribution transfer authorization
Title
Taconite economic development fund use clarification and 2018 distribution transfer authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Author added Eichorn |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4139 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Taxes