MN SF3574 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Administration of the fetal alcohol spectrum disorders prevention grants transfer to the Department of Health
Title
Administration of the fetal alcohol spectrum disorders prevention grants transfer to the Department of Health
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Paul Utke [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4076 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy