MN SF3546 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Dornink
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Dornink
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Income tax subtraction establishment for volunteer fire and rescue worker
Title
Income tax subtraction establishment for volunteer fire and rescue worker
Sponsors
Sen. Zach Duckworth [R] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Rich Draheim [R] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] |
Sen. Gene Dornink [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Dornink |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Chief author added Duckworth |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Rosen |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3749 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Authors added Theis, Raleigh, and Backer