MN SF3535 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial property assessed clean energy program modification
Title
Commercial property assessed clean energy program modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Author added Frentz |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Energy, Utilities, Environment, and Climate |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3946 (Similar To) 2024-04-24 - Author added Kraft