MN SF3534 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - Consent Calendar: Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-20 - Consent Calendar: Third reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Charter school admission requirements modification
Title
Charter school admission requirements modification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Consent Calendar: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-20 | Senate | Consent Calendar: Third reading Passed |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Author added Duckworth |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass, Consent Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3251 (Similar To) 2022-03-03 - Second reading