MN SF353 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Author stricken Fateh
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Author stricken Fateh
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota department of information technology (office of MN.IT) provisions technical changes
Title
Minnesota department of information technology (office of MN.IT) provisions technical changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Author stricken Fateh |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Author stricken Wiklund |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Chief author added Rosen |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Chief author stricken, shown as co-author Koran |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Author stricken Draheim |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF609 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Rules and Administration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Authors added Wiklund; Fateh |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Technology and Reform Policy |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF609 (Similar To) 2021-05-11 - Laid on table