MN SF3512 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance
Pending: Senate Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Acquisition of real property in fee approval requirement
Title
Acquisition of real property in fee approval requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Utke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | General Orders: Stricken and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3498 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Author added Poston.