MN SF3510 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3759
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Pipeline construction and routing authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pipeline construction and routing authorization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateRule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3759
2018-04-23SenateSecond reading
2018-04-23SenateComm report: Adopt previous comm report Joint rule 2.03 Suspended
2018-04-19SenateJoint rule 2.03, referred to Rules and Administration
2018-04-19SenateComm report: To pass
2018-04-16SenateAuthors added Utke; Tomassoni
2018-04-12SenateAuthor added Johnson
2018-03-22SenateAuthor added Eichorn
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy
2018-03-15SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3759 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Governor's action Veto

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback