MN SF3508 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child care licensing correction order posting requirements and foster care licensing moratorium modifications; adult foster care licensing analysis requirement
Title
Child care licensing correction order posting requirements and foster care licensing moratorium modifications; adult foster care licensing analysis requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Carla Nelson [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] | Sen. Mike Goggin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF3015 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3015 (Similar To) 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 153