MN SF3504 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Authors added Rosen; Ruud; Anderson
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Authors added Rosen; Ruud; Anderson
Pending: Senate Civil Law and Data Practices Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Parenting time provisions modifications
Title
Parenting time provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Kiffmeyer [R] | Sen. Karla Bigham [D] | Sen. Julie Rosen [R] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] |
Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Authors added Rosen; Ruud; Anderson |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Author added Bigham |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4187 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Author added Schomacker