MN SF3504 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 20, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Carbon reduction facility designation for certain nuclear energy electric generating facilities
Title
Carbon reduction facility designation for certain nuclear energy electric generating facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. Bruce Anderson [R] | Sen. David Osmek [R] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] |
Sen. David Senjem [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 20, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | House | Second reading |
2018-05-17 | House | Joint rule 2.03 waived |
2018-05-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2018-05-14 | House | Senate file first reading, referred to Rules and Legislative Administration |
2018-05-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 37-29 |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3708 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Joint rule 2.03, Deadlines, re-referred to Rules and Legislative Administration