MN SF3496 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Automobile emissions standards adoption authority of the pollution control agency (PCA) repeal; California motor vehicle emissions standards adoption economic impact study appropriation
Title
Automobile emissions standards adoption authority of the pollution control agency (PCA) repeal; California motor vehicle emissions standards adoption economic impact study appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Mathews [R] | Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Paul Gazelka [R] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] |
Sen. Mark Koran [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Author added Koran |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Author stricken Tomassoni |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3756 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Author added Torkelson