MN SF3463 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-17 - Third reading Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus bonding bill

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus bonding bill

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-17SenateThird reading Failed to pass
2020-05-17SenateAmended
2020-05-17SenateTaken from table
2020-05-17SenateLaid on table
2020-05-17SenateSpecial Order
2020-05-17SenateAuthor added Nelson
2020-05-16SenateSecond reading
2020-05-16SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2020-03-11SenateAuthor added Franzen
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Capital Investment
2020-02-20SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3622 (Similar To) 2020-03-02 - Author added Schultz

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback