MN SF3451 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vulnerable adults maltreatment quarterly report requirement
Title
Vulnerable adults maltreatment quarterly report requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] | Sen. Jerry Relph [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
Sen. Bernhard Eken [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Authors added Abeler; Eken |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Aging and Long-Term Care Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3857 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance