MN SF3450 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Author added Abeler
Pending: Senate Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Charter school provisions modifications
Title
Charter school provisions modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Authors added Mann; Coleman |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Education Policy |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3484 (Similar To) 2024-02-13 - Author added Pursell