MN SF3438 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Guardianship provisions modifications
Title
Guardianship provisions modifications
Sponsors
Sen. David Dibble [D] | Sen. Zaynab Mohamed [D] | Sen. John Hoffman [D] | Sen. Warren Limmer [R] |
Sen. Torrey Westrom [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Second reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Author added Westrom |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Authors added Mohamed; Hoffman; Limmer |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3483 (Similar To) 2024-03-25 - Author added Virnig