MN SF3434 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Boldon
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-19 - Author added Boldon
Pending: Senate Environment, Climate, and Legacy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rainy River headwaters watershed nonferrous mining prohibitions
Title
Rainy River headwaters watershed nonferrous mining prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | Senate | Author added Boldon |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Authors added Cwodzinski; Mann |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Environment, Climate, and Legacy |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3458 (Similar To) 2024-04-18 - Authors added Agbaje and Hicks