MN SF3422 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-13 - Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Job training program pay-for-performance grant modification
Title
Job training program pay-for-performance grant modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-13 | Senate | Rule 45-amend, subst. General Orders HF4429 |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Author added Housley |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Jobs and Economic Growth Finance and Policy |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF4429 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State Chapter 91