MN SF3418 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Kiffmeyer
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Author added Kiffmeyer
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Metropolitan council transportation finance, budget, appropriations, accounting, fiscal planning, and reporting provisions establishment and modification
Title
Metropolitan council transportation finance, budget, appropriations, accounting, fiscal planning, and reporting provisions establishment and modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Author added Kiffmeyer |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3369 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance