MN SF341 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 18 04/27/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Secretary of State Chapter 18 04/27/17
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public hospitals investment bill; Cook and Orr ambulance services hospital district tax use modification
Title
Public hospitals investment bill; Cook and Orr ambulance services hospital district tax use modification
Sponsors
Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] | Sen. Anthony Lourey [D] | Sen. Andrew Lang [R] | Sen. Jeff Hayden [D] |
Sen. Gary Dahms [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: Passage (Y: 120 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Secretary of State Chapter 18 04/27/17 | |
2017-05-01 | Governor's action Approval 04/27/17 | |
2017-04-27 | Governor approval | |
2017-04-27 | Returned from House | |
2017-04-25 | Presented to Governor | |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill was passed vote: 120-11 |
2017-04-24 | House | Third reading |
2017-04-20 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, April 24, 2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Second reading |
2017-04-20 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2017-04-18 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF559 |
2017-04-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 65-0 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF559 (Similar To) 2017-04-20 - HF indefinitely postponed