MN SF3379 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Human Services Reform Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Basic sliding fee child care temporary priorities permanency establishment
Title
Basic sliding fee child care temporary priorities permanency establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Human Services Reform Finance and Policy |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Education Finance and Policy |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3484 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Author added Feist