MN SF3353 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Chief author added Mathews
Pending: Senate State and Local Government and Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating a exclusion to protected classes

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating a exclusion to protected classes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-22SenateChief author added Mathews
2023-05-22SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Abeler
2023-05-21SenateAuthor stricken Hoffman
2023-05-20SenateReferred to State and Local Government and Veterans
2023-05-20SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3328 (Similar To) 2023-05-18 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback