MN SF3339 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Nelson
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of health requirement to study issues related to the development of a statewide registry for provider orders for life-sustaining treatment
Title
Commissioner of health requirement to study issues related to the development of a statewide registry for provider orders for life-sustaining treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Author added Nelson |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Author added Putnam |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3360 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Author added Bierman