MN SF3331 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-17 - HF substituted HF3230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-17 - HF substituted HF3230
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electric utility program that encourages efficient lighting to include promotion of LEDs
Title
Electric utility program that encourages efficient lighting to include promotion of LEDs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-17 | Senate | HF substituted HF3230 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Utilities Finance and Policy |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3230 (Similar To) 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State Chapter 105