MN SF3300 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Ignition interlock requirement for repeat driving impaired offenders; driving without a license after DWI-related offense not a payable offense
Title
Ignition interlock requirement for repeat driving impaired offenders; driving without a license after DWI-related offense not a payable offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3726 (Similar To) 2018-03-21 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance