MN SF3279 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts licensing requirements establishment; criminal penalties; appropriation
Title
Behavior analysts and assistant behavior analysts licensing requirements establishment; criminal penalties; appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Jensen [R] | Sen. Jim Abeler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Author added Abeler |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3213 (Similar To) 2020-04-07 - Author added Cantrell