MN SF3258 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Peace officer definition modification; corrections provisions modification; criminal justice data communications network use modification; grant programs temporary changes; criminal penalties authorization

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace officer definition modification; corrections provisions modification; criminal justice data communications network use modification; grant programs temporary changes; criminal penalties authorization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27 Secretary of State, Filed
2020-05-27 Governor approval
2020-05-27 Secretary of State Chapter 110
2020-05-27 Governor's action Approval
2020-05-18 Presented to Governor
2020-05-17SenateReturned from House
2020-05-17HouseBill was passed
2020-05-17HouseThird reading
2020-05-15HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Sunday, May 17, 2020
2020-05-15HouseSecond reading
2020-05-15HouseBills not identical, SF substituted on General Register
2020-05-14HouseSenate file first reading, referred for comparison HF3391
2020-05-14HouseReceived from Senate
2020-05-14SenateThird reading Passed
2020-05-14SenateSpecial Order: Amended
2020-05-13SenateChief author added Limmer
2020-05-13SenateChief author stricken, shown as co-author Ingebrigtsen
2020-03-09SenateSecond reading
2020-03-09SenateComm report: To pass as amended
2020-02-27SenateAuthors added Dziedzic; Pappas
2020-02-17SenateReferred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
2020-02-17SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF3391 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Author added Johnson

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback