MN SF3205 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Special transportation service providers regulations and penalties modifications; background studies on nonemergency medical transportation providers requirements establishment
Title
Special transportation service providers regulations and penalties modifications; background studies on nonemergency medical transportation providers requirements establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Health, Human Services and Housing |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Transportation and Public Safety |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3548 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Secretary of State Chapter 164