MN SF3202 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-19 - Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Water quality and sustainability account creation for settlement between the state and 3M company
Title
Water quality and sustainability account creation for settlement between the state and 3M company
Sponsors
Sen. Karin Housley [R] | Sen. Roger Chamberlain [R] | Sen. Mark Koran [R] | Sen. Caroline Ruud [R] |
Sen. William Ingebrigtsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3660 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Secretary of State Chapter 204