MN SF3201 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Commissioner of health direction to modify a requirement to obtain a Department of Health recommendation for the J-1 visa waiver program
Title
Commissioner of health direction to modify a requirement to obtain a Department of Health recommendation for the J-1 visa waiver program
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Howe [R] | Sen. Matt Klein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Author added Klein |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3161 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Author added Feist