MN SF3180 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-29 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Health-related professions temporary license suspensions and background checks modifications
Title
Health-related professions temporary license suspensions and background checks modifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Authors added Kiffmeyer; Nelson |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3640 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance