MN SF3157 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-14 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Omnibus Transportation appropriations
Title
Omnibus Transportation appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF2887 (Similar To) 2023-05-24 - Secretary of State Chapter 68