MN SF3146 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes
Pending: Senate Taxes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Hennepin county cities transportation sales and use tax use for roads and bridges within city limits authorization
Title
Hennepin county cities transportation sales and use tax use for roads and bridges within city limits authorization
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn and re-referred to Transportation Finance and Policy |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Taxes |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3482 (Similar To) 2018-04-16 - Author added Lucero.