MN SF3134 | 2023-2024 | 93rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-21 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Human remains conversion to basic elements using natural organic reduction; natural organic reduction facilities licensure requirements establishment

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human remains conversion to basic elements using natural organic reduction; natural organic reduction facilities licensure requirements establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-21SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services
2024-03-18SenateComm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety
2023-03-27SenateReferred to Health and Human Services
2023-03-27SenateIntroduction and first reading

Same As/Similar To

HF2669 (Similar To) 2024-03-11 - Authors added Hemmingsen-Jaeger and Curran

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback