MN SF3111 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Saltwater aquatic farms modifications; transportation or importation permit and quarantine requirement
Title
Saltwater aquatic farms modifications; transportation or importation permit and quarantine requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Weber [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Policy |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3472 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Second reading