MN SF3096 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-29 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wildland firefighters training and licensing provisions modification
Title
Wildland firefighters training and licensing provisions modification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF3615 (Similar To) 2018-03-12 - Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance